US SCR40 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-07-14 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text of measure as introduced: CR S4459)
Pending: Senate Rules And Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-07-14 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text of measure as introduced: CR S4459)
Pending: Senate Rules And Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the use of Emancipation Hall in the Capitol Visitor Center on September 10, 2014, for a ceremony to award congressional gold medals in honor of the men and women who perished as a result of the terrorist attacks on the United States on September 11, 2001.
Title
A concurrent resolution authorizing the use of Emancipation Hall in the Capitol Visitor Center for a ceremony to award Congressional Gold Medals in honor of the men and women who perished as a result of the terrorist attacks on the United States on September 11, 2001.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-14 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text of measure as introduced: CR S4459) |
Same As/Similar To
HCR106 (Same As) 2014-07-30 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/senate-concurrent-resolution/40/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/sconres40/BILLS-113sconres40is.pdf |