US SCR4 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-5-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses the sense of Congress that an appropriate site on Chaplains Hill in Arlington National Cemetery be provided for a memorial marker, to be paid for with private funds, to honor the memory of the Jewish chaplains who died while on active duty in the U.S. Armed Forces, so long as the Secretary of the Army has exclusive authority to approve the design and site of the memorial marker. Provides that the President should establish an Arlington National Cemetery Advisory Commission and procedures for the evaluation and approval of new monuments and memorials comparable to those provided in the Commemorative Works Act.
Title
A concurrent resolution expressing the sense of Congress that an appropriate site on Chaplains Hill in Arlington National Cemetery should be provided for a memorial marker to honor the memory of the Jewish chaplains who died while on active duty in the Armed Forces of the United States.
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Barbara Boxer [D-CA] | Sen. Scott Brown [R-MA] |
Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] |
Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Al Franken [D-MN] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Mike Johanns [R-NE] |
Sen. John Kerry [D-MA] | Sen. Mark Kirk [R-IL] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Frank Lautenberg [D-NJ] |
Sen. Carl Levin [D-MI] | Sen. Joseph Lieberman [I-CT] | Sen. Claire McCaskill [D-MO] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] |
Sen. Barbara Mikulski [D-MD] | Sen. Bill Nelson [D-FL] | Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] |
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Mark Udall [D-CO] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2011-06-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs. |
2011-05-27 | House | Referred to House Armed Services |
2011-05-27 | House | Referred to House Veterans' Affairs |
2011-05-27 | House | Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2011-05-27 | House | Received in the House. |
2011-05-27 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2011-05-26 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S3461) |
2011-05-26 | Senate | S.AMDT.388 Amendment SA 388 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2011-05-26 | Senate | S.AMDT.388 Amendment SA 388 proposed by Senator Klobuchar for Senator Murray. (consideration: CR S3461; text: CR S3461)To express the sense of Congress on the establishment of an advisory commission on memorials at Arlington National Cemetery and facilitate evaluation and approval of future monuments and memorials at the cemetery. |
2011-05-26 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S3460-3461) |
2011-05-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2011-01-26 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. (text of measure as introduced: CR S291) |
Same As/Similar To
HCR12 (Same As) 2011-05-12 - Provisions of measure incorporated into HR 1627.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Cemeteries and funerals
Military personnel and dependents
Monuments and memorials
Religion
Virginia
Cemeteries and funerals
Military personnel and dependents
Monuments and memorials
Religion
Virginia