US SCR37 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on August 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-14 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on August 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-14 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
This concurrent resolution honors the life and work of Louis Lorenzo Redding.
Title
A concurrent resolution honoring the life and work of Louis Lorenzo Redding, whose lifelong dedication to civil rights and service stand as an example of leadership for all people.
Sponsors
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-14 | House | Held at the desk. |
2020-08-14 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-08-11 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-08-06 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S5348) |
2020-08-06 | Senate | S.Amdt.2638 Amendment SA 2638 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-08-06 | Senate | S.Amdt.2638 Amendment SA 2638 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Coons. (consideration: CR S5347-5348; text: CR S5347-5348) To amend the preamble. |
2020-08-06 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S5347-5348) |
2020-08-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S1234-1235) |
Same As/Similar To
HCR93 (Same As) 2020-02-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Subjects
Civil rights and liberties, minority issues
Congressional tributes
Lawyers and legal services
Minority education
Racial and ethnic relations
U.S. history
Congressional tributes
Lawyers and legal services
Minority education
Racial and ethnic relations
U.S. history