US SCR31 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-12 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-12 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution providing for a conditional adjournment or recess of the Senate and an adjournment of the House of Representatives. Declares that when the Senate recesses or adjourns on any day from Thursday, February 11, 2016, through Saturday, February 20, 2016, it stand recessed or adjourned until 12:00 noon on Monday, February 22, 2016. Declares that when the House adjourns on any legislative day from Friday, February 12, 2016, through Tuesday, February 16, 2016, it stand adjourned until 2:00 p.m. on Tuesday, February 23, 2016.
Title
A concurrent resolution providing for a conditional adjournment or recess of the Senate and an adjournment of the House of Representatives.
Sponsors
Sen. Mitch McConnell [R-KY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-02-12 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H811) |
2016-02-12 | House | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H811) |
2016-02-12 | House | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2016-02-12 | House | Received in the House. |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S887; text as passed Senate: CR S886) |