US SCR31 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-26 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-26 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Summary
Declares that when the Senate recesses or adjourns on any day from Thursday, June 25, 2009 through Sunday, June 28, 2009, it stand recessed or adjourned until noon on Monday, July 6, 2009. Declares that when the House adjourns on any legislative day from Thursday, June 25, 2009, through Sunday, June 28, 2009, it stand adjourned until 2:00 p.m. on Tuesday, July 7, 2009.
Title
A concurrent resolution providing for a conditional adjournment or recess of the Senate, and a conditional adjournment of the House of Representatives.
Sponsors
Sen. Harry Reid [D-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-26 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2009-06-26 | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 243 - 180 (Roll no. 464). (text: CR H7461) | |
2009-06-26 | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H7461) | |
2009-06-25 | Held at the desk. | |
2009-06-25 | Message on Senate action sent to the House. | |
2009-06-25 | Received in the House. | |
2009-06-25 | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7112-7113; text as passed Senate: CR S7112-7113; text of measure as introduced: CR S7102) |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/senate-concurrent-resolution/31/all-info |