US SCR2 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-12 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-12 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution authorizing the use of Emancipation Hall in the Capitol Visitor Center for a ceremony to present the Congressional Gold Medal to the First Special Service Force, in recognition of its superior service during World War II. Authorizes the use of Emancipation Hall in the Capitol Visitor Center on February 3, 2015, for a ceremony to present the Congressional Gold Medal to the First Special Service Force in recognition of its service during World War II.
Title
A concurrent resolution authorizing the use of Emancipation Hall in the Capitol Visitor Center for a ceremony to present the Congressional Gold Medal to the First Special Service Force, in recognition of its superior service during World War II.
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2015-01-12 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H207) |
2015-01-12 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H207) |
2015-01-12 | House | Mrs. Comstock asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider. |
2015-01-09 | House | Held at the desk. |
2015-01-09 | House | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2015-01-09 | House | Received in the House. |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S117; text as passed Senate: CR S110) |
Same As/Similar To
HCR4 (Same As) 2015-01-06 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Subjects
Conflicts and wars
Congress
Congressional tributes
Military history
U.S. Capitol
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Congress
Congressional tributes
Military history
U.S. Capitol
Veterans' organizations and recognition