US SCR15 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on August 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-08-04 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on August 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-08-04 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution expressing support for the designation of October 28, 2017, as "Honoring the Nation's First Responders Day". Supports the designation of October 28, 2017, as Honoring the Nation's First Responders Day.
Title
A concurrent resolution expressing support for the designation of October 28, 2017, as "Honoring the Nation's First Responders Day".
Sponsors
Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR] | Sen. Claire McCaskill [D-MO] | Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-04 | House | Held at the desk. |
2017-08-04 | House | Received in the House. |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2017-08-03 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-07-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 183. |
2017-07-27 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment. Without written report. |
2017-07-26 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. (text of measure as introduced: CR S3047) |
Same As/Similar To
HCR56 (Related) 2017-05-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Emergency management
First responders and emergency personnel
Congressional tributes
Emergency management
First responders and emergency personnel