US SCR14 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-22 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-22 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This concurrent resolution authorizes the use of Emancipation Hall in the Capitol Visitor Center for an event on June 9, 2019, to celebrate the birthday of King Kamehameha I.
Title
A concurrent resolution authorizing the use of Emancipation Hall in the Capitol Visitor Center for an event to celebrate the birthday of King Kamehameha I.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-22 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-05-22 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H4110) |
2019-05-22 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H4110) |
2019-05-22 | House | Committee on House Administration discharged. |
2019-05-22 | House | Ms. Fudge asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider. |
2019-04-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on House Administration. |
2019-04-15 | House | Received in the House. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2456; text: CR S2446) |