US SCR11 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-25 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-25 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Declares that when the Senate recesses or adjourns on any day from Friday, March 22, 2013 through Tuesday, March 26, 2013, it stand recessed or adjourned until 12:00 noon on Monday, April 8, 2013. Declares that when the House adjourns on Monday, March 25, 2013, it stand adjourned until 2:00 p.m. on Tuesday, April 9, 2013.
Title
A concurrent resolution providing for a conditional adjournment or recess of the Senate and an adjournment of the House of Representatives.
Sponsors
Sen. Harry Reid [D-NV] | Sen. Mitch McConnell [R-KY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-25 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2013-03-25 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H1832) |
2013-03-25 | House | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H1832) |
2013-03-25 | House | Received in the House. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2013-03-23 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2435; text as passed Senate: CR S2339) |