US SCR1 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 5 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-05 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 5 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-05 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Declares that when the Senate adjourns or recesses on any day from Wednesday, January 5, 2011, through Monday, January 10, 2011, it stand adjourned or recessed until 10 a.m. on Tuesday, January 25, 2011. Declares that: (1) when the House adjourns on the legislative day of Wednesday, January 12, 2011, it stand adjourned until 2 p.m. on Tuesday, January 18, 2011, and (2) when it adjourns on any legislative day from Wednesday, January 26, 2011, through Friday, January 28, 2011, it stand adjourned until 2 p.m. on Tuesday, February 8, 2011.
Title
A concurrent resolution providing for a conditional recess or adjournment of the Senate and an adjournment of the House of Representatives.
Sponsors
Sen. Harry Reid [D-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-05 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2011-01-05 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H31) |
2011-01-05 | House | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H31) |
2011-01-05 | House | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2011-01-05 | House | Received in the House. |
2011-01-05 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S15; text as passed Senate: CR S15; text of measure as introduced: CR S67) |