US SB985 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
United States Coast Guard Commemorative Coin Act Directs the Secretary of the Treasury to mint and issue in commemoration of the United States Coast Guard: (1) $5 gold coins, (2) $1 silver coins, and (3) half-dollar clad coins. Requires the design of such coins to be emblematic of the traditions, history, and heritage of the Coast Guard, and its role in securing our nation since 1790. Prescribes design requirements. Restricts the issuance of such coins to the one-year period beginning on January 1, 2018. Prescribes the sale price of the coins and coin surcharges. Requires such surcharges to be paid by the Secretary to the National Coast Guard Museum Association to help finance the design and construction of the National Coast Guard Museum. Directs the Secretary to ensure that minting and issuing coins under this Act will not result in any net cost to the federal government.
Title
United States Coast Guard Commemorative Coin Act
Sponsors
Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-16 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1683 (Same As) 2015-03-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
SB1524 (Related) 2015-06-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB1524 (Related) 2015-06-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
Coast guard
Currency
Department of Homeland Security
Finance and financial sector
Military history
Military personnel and dependents
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Transportation employees
Currency
Department of Homeland Security
Finance and financial sector
Military history
Military personnel and dependents
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Transportation employees
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/senate-bill/985/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/s985/BILLS-114s985is.pdf |