US SB984 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Introduced on May 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text of measure as introduced in Senate: CR S2949-2954)
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text of measure as introduced in Senate: CR S2949-2954)
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Healthy Families Act - Requires certain employers, who employ 15 or more employees for each working day during 20 or more workweeks a year, to permit each employee to earn at least one hour of paid sick time for every 30 hours worked. Declares that an employer shall not be required to permit an employee to earn more than 56 hours of paid sick time in a calendar year, unless the employer chooses to set a higher limit. Allows employees to use such time to: (1) meet their own medical needs; (2) care for the medical needs of certain family members; or (3) seek medical attention, assist a related person, take legal action, or engage in other specified activities relating to domestic violence, sexual assault, or stalking. Prohibits an employer from interfering with an employee's exercise of such rights. Directs the Secretary of Labor to exercise certain investigative and enforcement authority for employees covered by the Family and Medical Leave Act of 1993 or the Government Employee Rights Act of 1991. Grants the same authority, for employees under their jurisdiction, to the Librarian of Congress, the Comptroller General, the Board of Directors of the congressional Office of Compliance, and the Merit Systems Protection Board. Authorizes civil actions by employees, individuals, or their representatives for damages or equitable relief against employers who violate this Act. Waives a state's sovereign immunity with respect to a suit brought by an employee of a federally-assisted state program or activity for relief authorized under this Act. Requires the Commissioner of Labor Statistics annually to compile information annually on paid sick time, and the Comptroller General to study related matters. Declares that nothing in this Act shall be construed to discourage employers from adopting or retaining more generous leave policies.
Title
Healthy Families Act
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Harkin [D-IA] | Sen. Daniel Akaka [D-HI] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] |
Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Al Franken [D-MN] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] |
Sen. Daniel Inouye [D-HI] | Sen. Tim Johnson [D-SD] | Sen. John Kerry [D-MA] | Sen. Frank Lautenberg [D-NJ] |
Sen. Carl Levin [D-MI] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Barbara Mikulski [D-MD] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] |
Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] | Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-12 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text of measure as introduced in Senate: CR S2949-2954) |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S2948-2949) |
Same As/Similar To
HB1876 (Related) 2011-09-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Workforce Protections.
HB2346 (Related) 2011-09-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
SB2252 (Related) 2012-03-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB5727 (Related) 2012-06-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB2346 (Related) 2011-09-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
SB2252 (Related) 2012-03-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB5727 (Related) 2012-06-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Subjects
Civil actions and liability
Congressional oversight
Domestic violence and child abuse
Employee leave
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Government liability
Government studies and investigations
Labor and employment
Sex offenses
State and local government operations
Congressional oversight
Domestic violence and child abuse
Employee leave
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Government liability
Government studies and investigations
Labor and employment
Sex offenses
State and local government operations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/senate-bill/984/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/s984/BILLS-112s984is.pdf |