US SB939 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-15 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-15 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Addresses China's influence on postsecondary educational institutions through Confucius Institutes, which are cultural institutes directly or indirectly funded by the Chinese government. Specifically, the bill establishes requirements for postsecondary educational institutions that receive federal funding and that have contracts or agreements with Confucius Institutes. The contracts or agreements must include clear provisions that (1) protect the academic freedom of the institutions; (2) prohibit the application of foreign law on the institutions' campuses; and (3) grant full managerial authority of the institutes to the institutions, including full control over teaching plans, activities, research grants, and employment decisions.
Title
CONFUCIUS Act Concerns Over Nations Funding University Campus Institutes in the United States Act
Sponsors
Sen. John Kennedy [R-LA] | Sen. Doug Jones [D-AL] | Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-15 | House | Held at the desk. |
2020-06-15 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S2860-2861) |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2859-2861) |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB7601 (Same As) 2020-07-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
SB4629 (Related) 2020-09-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
SB4629 (Related) 2020-09-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Subjects
Area studies and international education
Asia
China
Contracts and agency
Education
Education programs funding
Higher education
Research administration and funding
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Asia
China
Contracts and agency
Education
Education programs funding
Higher education
Research administration and funding
Teaching, teachers, curricula