US SB93 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-06-24 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 89.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Permanently authorizes the President to impose visa- and property-blocking sanctions based on violations of human rights, and it revises the President's authority to impose these sanctions. The bill expands the actors and abuses currently eligible for these sanctions by implementing the standard of serious human rights abuse for the imposition of sanctions. The bill authorizes the President to impose sanctions on any foreign person (or any immediate family member of a person) who (1) is responsible for serious human rights abuse, (2) is a current or former government official who is responsible for or complicit in corruption, (3) is or has been a leader or official of an entity that has engaged in any of these activities, (4) has provided support for any of these activities, or (5) is owned or controlled by a person subject to these sanctions. The President must report on additional steps taken through diplomacy, international engagement, and assistance to foreign or security sectors to address causes of serious human rights abuse and corruption.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Global Magnitsky Human Rights Accountability Reauthorization Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-24SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 89.
2021-06-24SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Menendez with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
2021-06-22SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
2021-01-28SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Same As/Similar To

SB3725 (Related) 2022-03-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback