US SB921 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 561.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 561.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Raechel and Jacqueline Houck Safe Rental Car Act of 2013 - (Sec. 3) Authorizes a rental company that receives a notification (approved by the National Highway Traffic Safety Administration [NHTSA]) from the manufacturer of a covered rental vehicle about any equipment defect, or noncompliance with federal motor vehicle safety standards, to rent or sell the vehicle or equipment only if the defect or noncompliance is remedied. Specifies any rental vehicle: (1) rated at 10,000 pounds gross vehicle weight or less, (2) rented without a driver for an initial term of under 4 months, and (3) that is part of a motor vehicle fleet of 5 or more motor vehicles used for rental purposes by a rental company. Prescribes a special rule to require rental companies to comply with specified limitations on sale, lease, or rental of a motor vehicle as soon as practicable, but within 24 hours after the earliest receipt of the manufacturer's notification of a defect or noncompliance with vehicle safety standards, whether by electronic means or first class mail. Extends the 24-hour deadline for complying with such limitations to 48 hours if the notification covers more than 5,000 motor vehicles in the rental company's fleet. Permits a rental company to rent (but not sell or lease) a motor vehicle subject to recall if the defect or noncompliance remedy is not immediately available and the company takes any actions specified in the notice to alter the vehicle temporarily to eliminate the safety risk posed. Makes these special rules for rental companies inapplicable to junk automobiles. (Sec. 4) Prohibits a rental company from knowingly making inoperable any safety devices or elements of design installed on or in a compliant motor vehicle or vehicle equipment unless the company reasonably believes the vehicle or equipment will not be used when the devices or elements are inoperable. (Sec. 5) Authorizes the Secretary, upon request, to inspect records of a rental company with respect to a safety investigation. Authorizes the Secretary to require a rental company to keep records or make reports for purposes of compliance with federal motor vehicle safety orders or regulations. (Sec. 6) Authorizes the Secretary to study the effectiveness of the amendments made by this Act and of other activities of rental companies. (Sec. 7) Amends the Moving Ahead for Progress in the 21st Century Act (MAP-21) to require the mandatory study of the safety of rental trucks during a specified seven-year period to evaluate the completion of safety recall remedies on rental trucks. (Sec. 8) Directs the Secretary to solicit comments regarding the implementation of this Act from members of the public, including rental companies, consumer organizations, automobile manufacturers, and automobile dealers.
Title
Raechel and Jacqueline Houck Safe Rental Car Act of 2013
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Barbara Boxer [D-CA] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] |
Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Claire McCaskill [D-MO] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] |
Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 561. |
2014-09-15 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Rockefeller without amendment. With written report No. 113-253. |
2013-07-30 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation Subcommittee on Consumer Protection, Product Safety, and Insurance . Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 113-64. |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2760 (Related) 2014-07-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB2819 (Related) 2014-09-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB2819 (Related) 2014-09-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
Business records
Consumer affairs
Government studies and investigations
Lease and rental services
Motor vehicles
Product safety and quality
Transportation and public works
Transportation safety and security
Consumer affairs
Government studies and investigations
Lease and rental services
Motor vehicles
Product safety and quality
Transportation and public works
Transportation safety and security