US SB910 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-18 - Became Public Law No: 116-221. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-18 - Became Public Law No: 116-221. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Reauthorizes through FY2024 and revises the National Sea Grant College Program, through which the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration (NOAA) supports university-based programs that focus on studying, conserving, and effectively using U.S. coastal resources. Among other things, the bill requires NOAA to award Dean John A. Knauss Marine Policy Fellowships. Currently, NOAA has discretion in awarding such fellowships. The fellowships support the placement of graduate students in fields related to ocean, coastal, and Great Lakes resources in positions with the executive and legislative branches. The bill reauthorizes through FY2024 grants for (1) university research on the biology, prevention, and control of aquatic nonnative species; (2) university research on oyster diseases, oyster restoration, and oyster-related human health risks; (3) university research on the biology, prevention, and forecasting of harmful algal blooms; and (4) fishery extension activities conducted by sea grant colleges or sea grant institutes to enhance existing core program funding. The bill authorizes grants for (1) priority issues identified in the National Sea Grant Program's strategic plan, and (2) university research on sustainable aquaculture techniques and technologies.
Title
National Sea Grant College Program Amendments Act of 2020
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] |
Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-18 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 116-221. (TXT | PDF) |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2020-12-08 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2020-12-03 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-12-02 | Senate | Senate agreed to the House amendment to S. 910 by Voice Vote. |
2020-12-02 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7188) |
2020-11-17 | Senate | Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill. |
2020-11-16 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-11-16 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5741-5743) |
2020-11-16 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 910. |
2020-11-16 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5741-5744) |
2020-11-16 | House | Mr. Huffman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-10-01 | House | Held at the desk. |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-10-01 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-09-30 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S5990-5991) |
2020-09-30 | Senate | S.Amdt.2674 Amendment SA 2674 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-09-30 | Senate | S.Amdt.2674 Amendment SA 2674 proposed by Senator Portman for Senator Wicker. (consideration: CR S6000; text: CR S5990-5991) In the nature of a substitute. |
2020-09-30 | Senate | The committee substitute withdrawn by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-09-30 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S5999-6000) |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 426. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-216. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2405 (Related) 2019-12-05 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 262.
HB729 (Related) 2019-12-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB729 (Related) 2019-12-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Agricultural research
Aquaculture
Aquatic ecology
Congressional committees
Congressional officers and employees
Congressional oversight
Department of Commerce
Education programs funding
Executive agency funding and structure
Food supply, safety, and labeling
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Great Lakes
Higher education
Lakes and rivers
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Public lands and natural resources
Research administration and funding
Science and engineering education
Seafood
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Student aid and college costs
Agricultural research
Aquaculture
Aquatic ecology
Congressional committees
Congressional officers and employees
Congressional oversight
Department of Commerce
Education programs funding
Executive agency funding and structure
Food supply, safety, and labeling
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Great Lakes
Higher education
Lakes and rivers
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Public lands and natural resources
Research administration and funding
Science and engineering education
Seafood
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Student aid and college costs