US SB904 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-14 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 38.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-14 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 38.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Craft Beverage Bond Simplification Act of 2015 (Sec. 2) This bill allows taxpayers who are liable for not more than $50,000 per year in excise taxes on distilled spirits, wine, or beer to file and pay such taxes quarterly without the requirement to post a bond covering the operations and withdrawals of such distilled spirits, wines, or beer. The bill also allows such a taxpayer who reasonably expects to have a tax liability of not more than $1,000 per year and who was liable for not more than $1,000 in taxes in the preceding calendar year to file and pay such taxes annually rather than quarterly. Makes this Act effective 90 days after its enactment.
Title
Craft Beverage Bond Simplification Act of 2015
Sponsors
Sen. Orrin Hatch [R-UT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 38. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Committee on Finance. Original measure reported to Senate by Senator Hatch. With written report No. 114-15. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2238 (Same As) 2015-05-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB1562 (Related) 2015-06-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB2903 (Related) 2015-07-08 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H4875)
HB2029 (Related) 2015-12-18 - Became Public Law No: 114-113. (TXT | PDF)
SB1562 (Related) 2015-06-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB2903 (Related) 2015-07-08 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H4875)
HB2029 (Related) 2015-12-18 - Became Public Law No: 114-113. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/senate-bill/904/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/s904/BILLS-114s904pcs.pdf |