US SB899 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-11-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 231.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-11-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 231.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Nutria Eradication and Control Act of 2011 - Amends the Nutria Eradication and Control Act of 2003 to revise the nutria eradication program by authorizing the Secretary of the Interior to provide financial assistance to Delaware, Louisiana, Maryland, North Carolina, Oregon, Virginia, and Washington (currently, only to Maryland and Louisiana). Establishes the goals of such Program as: (1) eradicating nutria in Maryland; (2) eradicating or controlling nutria in Louisiana, Delaware, North Carolina, Oregon, Virginia, and Washington; and (3) restoring wetlands damaged by nutria. Requires that the Maryland program consist of management, research, and public education activities carried out in accordance with the United States Fish and Wildlife Service's document entitled "Eradication Strategies for Nutria in the Chesapeake and Delaware Bay Watersheds," dated March 2002 and updated in March 2009. Authorizes appropriations for such program for FY2012-FY2016 for financial assistance to the state of Maryland, the state of Louisiana, and on a competitive basis, to other coastal states. Requires the Secretary and the National Invasive Species Council to develop long-term nutria control or eradication programs to: (1) significantly reduce and restore nutria damaged wetlands in Delaware, Oregon, North Carolina, Virginia, and Washington; and (2) promote voluntary, public-private partnerships to eradicate or control nutria and restore nutria-damaged wetlands in such states.
Title
Nutria Eradication and Control Act of 2011
Sponsors
Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Kay Hagan [D-NC] | Sen. Mary Landrieu [D-LA] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] |
Sen. Barbara Mikulski [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-11-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 231. |
2011-11-15 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Boxer with an amendment. With written report No. 112-94. |
2011-07-13 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2011-05-05 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2739-2740) |
2011-05-05 | Senate | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S2738-2739) |
Same As/Similar To
HB1829 (Same As) 2011-05-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs.
SB3525 (Related) 2012-11-26 - Returned to the Calendar. Calendar No. 504.
SB3525 (Related) 2012-11-26 - Returned to the Calendar. Calendar No. 504.
Subjects
Chesapeake Bay
Delaware
Ecology
Environmental protection
Louisiana
Mammals
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Maryland
North Carolina
Oregon
Public-private cooperation
Virginia
Washington State
Wetlands
Delaware
Ecology
Environmental protection
Louisiana
Mammals
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Maryland
North Carolina
Oregon
Public-private cooperation
Virginia
Washington State
Wetlands