US SB89 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expands the boundary of the Fort Frederica National Monument on St. Simons Island, Georgia, and increases the maximum number of acres that may be included in the monument from 250 to 305 acres.
Title
Fort Frederica National Monument Boundary Expansion Act
Sponsors
Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-10 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB114 (Related) 2019-02-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
SB47 (Related) 2019-03-12 - Became Public Law No: 116-9. (TXT | PDF)
HCR21 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
SB47 (Related) 2019-03-12 - Became Public Law No: 116-9. (TXT | PDF)
HCR21 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Subjects
Georgia
Historic sites and heritage areas
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Military history
Monuments and memorials
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Historic sites and heritage areas
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Military history
Monuments and memorials
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/89/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s89/BILLS-116s89is.pdf |