US SB877 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-6-3)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-12 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-12 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes it illegal to possess, buy, sell, or transport shark fins or any product containing shark fins, except for certain dogfish fins. A person may possess a shark fin that was lawfully taken consistent with a license or permit under certain circumstances. Penalties are imposed for violations under the Magnuson-Stevens Fishery Conservation and Management Act. The maximum civil penalty for each violation shall be $100,000, or the fair market value of the shark fins involved, whichever is greater.
Title
Shark Fin Sales Elimination Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 325. |
2019-12-12 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker without amendment. With written report No. 116-173. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB614 (Related) 2019-02-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
HB737 (Related) 2019-11-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB737 (Related) 2019-11-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
Animal protection and human-animal relationships
Animals
Civil actions and liability
Fishes
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Animals
Civil actions and liability
Fishes
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection