US SB867 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-5)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-17 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-17 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Law Enforcement Mental Health and Wellness Act of 2017 (Sec. 2) This bill directs the Department of Justice (DOJ) to report on Department of Defense and Department of Veterans Affairs mental health practices and services that could be adopted by law enforcement agencies. Additionally, DOJ's Office of Community Oriented Policing Services must report on programs to address the psychological health and well-being of law enforcement officers. The bill amends the Omnibus Crime Control and Safe Streets Act of 1968 to expand the allowable use of grant funds under the Community Oriented Policing Services (COPS) program to include establishing peer mentoring mental health and wellness pilot programs within state, local, and tribal law enforcement agencies. (Sec. 3) DOJ must coordinate with the Department of Health and Human Services to develop educational resources for mental health providers regarding the culture of law enforcement agencies and therapies for mental health issues common to law enforcement officers. (Sec. 4) DOJ must also: (1) review existing crisis hotlines, recommend improvements, and research annual mental health checks; (2) examine the mental health and wellness needs of federal officers; and (3) ensure that recommendations, resources, or programs under this bill protect the privacy of participating officers.
Title
Law Enforcement Mental Health and Wellness Act of 2017
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Donnelly [D-IN] | Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] |
Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Orrin Hatch [R-UT] |
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] |
Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2017-05-17 | House | Received in the House. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S2955) |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2955) |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2228 (Same As) 2018-01-10 - Became Public Law No: 115-113. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Crime and law enforcement
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government studies and investigations
Health promotion and preventive care
Law enforcement officers
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Mental health
Right of privacy
Worker safety and health
Crime and law enforcement
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government studies and investigations
Health promotion and preventive care
Law enforcement officers
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Mental health
Right of privacy
Worker safety and health