US SB863 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on April 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends title XVI (Supplemental Security Income) (SSI) of the Social Security Act to provide that the value of certain funeral and burial arrangements involving an irrevocable trust whose named beneficiary is the funeral provider are not to be considered, under the SSI program, as resources available to the individual.
Title
A bill to amend title XVI of the Social Security Act to clarify that the value of certain funeral and burial arrangements are not to be considered available resources under the supplemental security income program.
Sponsors
Sen. Olympia Snowe [R-ME] | Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] | Sen. Mike Johanns [R-NE] | Sen. Tim Johnson [D-SD] |
Sen. John Thune [R-SD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-14 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB935 (Related) 2011-03-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Human Resources.
SB2150 (Related) 2012-03-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text of measure as introduced: CR S1201)
HB4149 (Related) 2012-03-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Human Resources.
SB2150 (Related) 2012-03-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text of measure as introduced: CR S1201)
HB4149 (Related) 2012-03-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Human Resources.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/senate-bill/863/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/s863/BILLS-112s863is.pdf |