US SB86 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Oregon Wildlands Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Oregon Wildlands Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-10SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Same As/Similar To

SB47 (Related) 2019-03-12 - Became Public Law No: 116-9.
HB1160 (Related) 2019-02-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
HCR21 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
SB1262 (Related) 2019-05-14 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback