US SB836 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Transportation Access for All Americans Act - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to: (1) allow accelerated depreciation of applicable leased highway property, and (2) provide for amortization of intangibles relating to such property. Defines "applicable leased highway property" as property subject to a lease between a taxpayer and a governmental entity under which the taxpayer leases a highway and associated improvements, receives a right-of-way on public lands underlying such highway and improvements, and receives a grant of a franchise or other intangible right to receive payments relating to the operation of such highway. Prohibits private activity bond financing of applicable leased highway property.
Title
Transportation Access for All Americans Act
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Bingaman [D-NM] | Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-14 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2132 (Related) 2012-02-27 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 327.
HB14 (Related) 2012-03-21 - Referred to House Foreign Affairs
HB4348 (Related) 2012-07-06 - Became Public Law No: 112-141.
SB1813 (Related) 2012-04-24 - See also H.R. 4348.
HB14 (Related) 2012-03-21 - Referred to House Foreign Affairs
HB4348 (Related) 2012-07-06 - Became Public Law No: 112-141.
SB1813 (Related) 2012-04-24 - See also H.R. 4348.
Subjects
Business investment and capital
Income tax deductions
Land use and conservation
Roads and highways
Taxation
Transportation programs funding
Income tax deductions
Land use and conservation
Roads and highways
Taxation
Transportation programs funding
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/senate-bill/836/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/s836/BILLS-112s836is.pdf |