US SB82 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates approximately 99,653 acres of Forest Service land in Oregon as the Frank and Jeanne Moore Wild Steelhead Special Management Area.
Title
Frank and Jeanne Moore Wild Steelhead Special Management Area Designation Act
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-10 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
SB47 (Related) 2019-03-12 - Became Public Law No: 116-9. (TXT | PDF)
HB993 (Related) 2019-02-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
HB1056 (Same As) 2019-02-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
HCR21 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HB993 (Related) 2019-02-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
HB1056 (Same As) 2019-02-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
HCR21 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Subjects
Fishes
Forests, forestry, trees
Hunting and fishing
Oregon
Outdoor recreation
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Forests, forestry, trees
Hunting and fishing
Oregon
Outdoor recreation
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/82/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s82/BILLS-116s82is.pdf |