US SB817 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-14 - Became Public Law No: 114-262.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-14 - Became Public Law No: 114-262.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to provide for the addition of certain real property to the reservation of the Siletz Tribe in the State of Oregon. (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Siletz Tribe Indian Restoration Act to authorize the Department of the Interior to take into trust for the Siletz Tribe additional lands that lie within the original 1855 Siletz Coast Reservation and are located in Benton, Douglas, Lane, Lincoln, Tillamook, and Yamhill counties in Oregon. Such land must be considered and evaluated as an on-reservation acquisition and become part of the tribe's reservation. (Off-reservation land acquisition requests require Interior to give greater scrutiny to the tribe's justification of the anticipated benefits from the acquisition.) Gaming is prohibited on lands taken into trust pursuant to this Act.
Title
A bill to provide for the addition of certain real property to the reservation of the Siletz Tribe in the State of Oregon.
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-14 | House | Became Public Law No: 114-262. |
2016-12-14 | House | Signed by President. |
2016-12-08 | House | Presented to President. |
2016-12-06 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-12-06 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7212) |
2016-12-06 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 817. |
2016-12-06 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7212) |
2016-12-06 | House | Mr. Bishop (UT) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2016-07-18 | House | Held at the desk. |
2016-07-18 | House | Received in the House. |
2016-07-15 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2016-07-14 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5191-5192; text as passed Senate: CR S5191-5192) |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 380. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Barrasso without amendment. With written report No. 114-219. |
2015-11-18 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2015-10-07 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 114-260. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1664; text of measure as introduced: CR S1666) |
Same As/Similar To
HB3211 (Same As) 2016-05-11 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 437.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Department of the Interior
Gambling
Indian lands and resources rights
Land transfers
Native Americans
Oregon
Department of the Interior
Gambling
Indian lands and resources rights
Land transfers
Native Americans
Oregon