US SB810 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
SGR Repeal and Medicare Provider Payment Modernization Act of 2015 Amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act (SSAct) to: (1) remove sustainable growth rate (SGR) methodology from the determination of annual conversion factors in the formula for payment for physicians' services, and (2) revise the update in rates for 2015 and subsequent years. Directs the Secretary of Health and Human Services to establish a Merit-based Incentive Payment (MIP) system under which eligible professionals (including physicians, physician assistants, nurse practitioners, clinical nurse specialists, and certified registered nurse anesthetists) shall receive annual payment increases or decreases based on their performance. Requires specified incentive payments to eligible participants in an alternative payment model. Requires the Secretary to: (1) draft a plan for development of quality measures to assess professionals, including non-patient-facing professionals; and (2) make payments for chronic care management services. Expands the kinds of uses of Medicare data available to qualified entities. Directs the Secretary to provide Medicare data to qualified clinical data registries to facilitate quality improvement or patient safety. Declares it a national objective to achieve widespread exchange of health information through interoperable certified electronic health records technology nationwide by December 31, 2018.
Title
SGR Repeal and Medicare Provider Payment Modernization Act of 2015
Sponsors
Sen. Orrin Hatch [R-UT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-19 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2 (Related) 2015-04-16 - Became Public Law No: 114-10. (TXT | PDF)
HB804 (Related) 2015-02-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB1470 (Same As) 2015-03-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HB804 (Related) 2015-02-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB1470 (Same As) 2015-03-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Child health
Congressional oversight
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Health promotion and preventive care
Health technology, devices, supplies
Medicaid
Medical research
Medicare
Minority health
Performance measurement
Poverty and welfare assistance
Right of privacy
Rural conditions and development
User charges and fees
Child health
Congressional oversight
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Health promotion and preventive care
Health technology, devices, supplies
Medicaid
Medical research
Medicare
Minority health
Performance measurement
Poverty and welfare assistance
Right of privacy
Rural conditions and development
User charges and fees
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/senate-bill/810/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/s810/BILLS-114s810is.pdf |