US SB808 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-9-1)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-09 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 501.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Sports Medicine Licensure Clarity Act of 2017 This bill extends the liability insurance coverage of a state-licensed medical professional to another state when the professional provides medical services to an athlete, athletic team, or team staff member pursuant to a written agreement. Prior to providing such services, the medical professional must disclose to the insurer the nature and extent of the services. This extension of coverage does not apply at a health care facility or while a medical professional licensed in the state is transporting the injured individual to a health care facility.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sports Medicine Licensure Clarity Act of 2017

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-09SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 501.
2018-07-09SenateCommittee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
2018-06-26SenateCommittee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
2017-04-04SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.

Same As/Similar To

HB302 (Same As) 2018-10-05 - Became Public Law No: 115-254.
HR1082 (Related) 2018-09-26 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback