US SB807 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on November 16 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-16 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 16 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-16 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal Antitrust Anti-Retaliation Act of 2017 (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Antitrust Criminal Penalty Enhancement and Reform Act of 2004 to prohibit an employer from discharging, demoting, suspending, harassing, or in any other manner discriminating against an employee, contractor, subcontractor, or agent of such employer (covered individual) who: (1) provided information to the federal government or a person with supervisory authority over the covered individual (or such other person working for the employer who has the authority to investigate, discover, or terminate misconduct) concerning a violation of antitrust law or of another criminal law committed in conjunction with a potential violation of antitrust law or in conjunction with an antitrust investigation by the Department of Justice; or (2) filed, testified, participated, or otherwise assisted in an investigation relating to such a violation. This protection does not extend to any covered individual who planned and initiated such a violation or an obstruction to its investigation. A violation with respect to the antitrust laws shall not be construed to include a civil violation of any law that is not also a criminal violation. A covered individual who alleges discharge or other discrimination by an employer in violation of such prohibition is authorized to seek relief: (1) by filing a complaint with the Department of Labor; or (2) if Labor has not issued a final decision within 180 days of such filing, by bringing an action at law or equity in the appropriate U.S. district court. A covered individual who prevails in any such action is entitled to all relief necessary to make such individual whole, including reinstatement with the same status, back pay plus interest, and compensation for special damages sustained.
Title
Criminal Antitrust Anti-Retaliation Act of 2017
Sponsors
Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] |
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. John Kennedy [R-LA] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-16 | House | Held at the desk. |
2017-11-16 | House | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2017-11-16 | House | Received in the House. |
2017-11-15 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7266-7267; text: CR S7266-7267) |
2017-11-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 258. |
2017-11-02 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Grassley without amendment. Without written report. |
2017-11-02 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Civil actions and liability
Commerce
Competition and antitrust
Congressional oversight
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Civil actions and liability
Commerce
Competition and antitrust
Congressional oversight
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Employment discrimination and employee rights