US SB799 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-25 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 65.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-25 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 65.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the President, by May 15, 2013, to submit to Congress a qualifying sequester replacement plan proposing to cancel permanently at least $85.333 billion of budgetary resources available for FY2013 from any discretionary appropriations or direct spending account. Requires further that: up to $42.666.500 billion of budgetary resources be cancelled from defense spending (budget function 050); any cancellation of such budgetary resources comply with the policies under and consistent with amounts authorized in the National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2013 (NDAA FY2013); the cancellation is not implemented through changes to programs or activities contained in the Internal Revenue Code, or increases governmental receipts, offsetting collections, or offsetting receipts; any cancellation of budgetary resources in a non-defense spending account may not be offset against an increase in another such account; and the proposed cancellation reduces outlays by at least $82.500 billion by the end of FY2018. Sets forth requirements for expedited consideration of a joint resolution of disapproval in both chambers of the qualifying sequester replacement plan. Requires the President, if the joint resolution of disapproval is not enacted within seven calendar days after May 15, 2013, to cancel: (1) any sequestration order issued under the Balanced Budget and Emergency Deficit Control Act of 1985 (Gramm-Rudman-Hollings Act) for enforcement of a specified budget goal, and (2) the budgetary resources submitted in the qualifying sequester replacement plan.
Title
A bill to provide for a sequester replacement.
Sponsors
Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] | Sen. Pat Toomey [R-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-25 | Senate | Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 65. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. |
Same As/Similar To
SB16 (Related) 2013-02-28 - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure withdrawn in Senate. (consideration: CR S991)
Subjects
Appropriations
Budget deficits and national debt
Budget process
Congressional oversight
Defense spending
Department of Defense
Economics and public finance
Executive agency funding and structure
House of Representatives
Legislative rules and procedure
Senate
Budget deficits and national debt
Budget process
Congressional oversight
Defense spending
Department of Defense
Economics and public finance
Executive agency funding and structure
House of Representatives
Legislative rules and procedure
Senate
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/senate-bill/799/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/s799/BILLS-113s799pcs.pdf |