US SB795 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-14 - Became Public Law No: 114-261.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-14 - Became Public Law No: 114-261.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to enhance whistleblower protection for contractor and grantee employees. (Sec. 1) This bill extends federal contractor whistle-blower protections to employees of: (1) personal services contractors working on defense contracts (currently, the protections apply to employees of defense contractors, subcontractors, grantees, or subgrantees); and (2) personal services contractors or subgrantees working on federal civilian contracts (currently, the protections apply to employees of civilian contractors, subcontractors, or grantees). The civilian contractor protections, which are currently in effect as a pilot program, are made permanent. The bill extends the prohibition against reimbursement of legal fees incurred in defending against reprisal claims brought by whistle-blowers to defense and civilian subcontractors and personal services contractors.
Title
A bill to enhance whistleblower protection for contractor and grantee employees.
Sponsors
Sen. Claire McCaskill [D-MO] | Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-14 | House | Became Public Law No: 114-261. |
2016-12-14 | House | Signed by President. |
2016-12-07 | House | Presented to President. |
2016-12-05 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-12-05 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7147) |
2016-12-05 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 795. |
2016-12-05 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7147-7149) |
2016-12-05 | House | Mr. Chaffetz moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2016-07-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness. |
2016-06-28 | House | Referred to House Armed Services |
2016-06-28 | House | Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform |
2016-06-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2016-06-28 | House | Received in the House. |
2016-06-24 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4560-4561; text: CR S4561) |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 506. |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 114-270. |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3011 (Related) 2016-06-06 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 505.
Subjects
Civil actions and liability
Congressional oversight
Defense spending
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Legal fees and court costs
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Public contracts and procurement
Congressional oversight
Defense spending
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Legal fees and court costs
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Public contracts and procurement