US SB765 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on August 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-08-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on August 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-08-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Private Corrado Piccoli Purple Heart Preservation Act This bill provides that regulations restricting the purchase, production, sale, or exchange of military medals or decorations may not authorize the sale of a Purple Heart awarded to a member of the Armed Forces, unless the sale is conducted by the member to whom the Purple Heart was awarded.
Title
Private Corrado Piccoli Purple Heart Preservation Act
Sponsors
Sen. David Perdue [R-GA] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] |
Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. Luther Strange [R-AL] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2017-08-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2017-08-04 | House | Received in the House. |
2017-08-03 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2017-08-03 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-08-03 | Senate | S.Amdt.767 Amendment SA 767 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-08-03 | Senate | S.Amdt.767 Amendment SA 767 proposed by Senator Perdue. (consideration: CR S4806; text: CR S4806) In the nature of a substitute. |
2017-08-03 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S4806) |
2017-08-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB544 (Related) 2017-02-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Conflicts and wars
Crime and law enforcement
Marketing and advertising
Military personnel and dependents
Retail and wholesale trades
Conflicts and wars
Crime and law enforcement
Marketing and advertising
Military personnel and dependents
Retail and wholesale trades