US SB756 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on July 15 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-07-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Pending: House Foreign Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 15 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-07-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Pending: House Foreign Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Syrian War Crimes Accountability Act of 2015 (Sec. 3) Declares that Congress: condemns the ongoing violence, use of chemical weapons, targeting of civilian populations, and systematic gross human rights violations carried out by government of Syria and pro-government forces under the direction of President Bashar al-Assad, as well as abuses committed by extremist groups and other combatants involved in the civil war in Syria; supports the people of Syria seeking democratic change; urges all parties to the conflict to halt attacks on civilians; calls on the President to support efforts in Syria and on the part of the international community to ensure accountability for war crimes and crimes against humanity committed during the conflict; and calls for a United Nations Security Council investigation into gross violations of human rights and war crimes committed during the Syrian conflict. (Sec. 4) Requires the Department of State to report to Congress regarding war crimes and crimes against humanity in Syria, including descriptions of: violations of internationally recognized human rights, war crimes, and crimes against humanity perpetrated during the civil war in Syria; and efforts by the Department and the U.S. Agency for International Development to ensure accountability for violations of internationally recognized human rights, international humanitarian law, and crimes against humanity perpetrated in Syria by the regime of President Bashar al-Assad, violent extremist groups, and other combatants involved in the conflict.
Title
Syrian War Crimes Accountability Act of 2015
Sponsors
Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] |
Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2015-07-15 | House | Received in the House. |
2015-07-15 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2015-07-14 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5088-5089; text as passed Senate: CR S5088-5089) |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 117. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker without amendment. Without written report. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
Subjects
Chemical and biological weapons
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Foreign aid and international relief
Human rights
International affairs
International law and treaties
Middle East
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Syria
United Nations
War crimes, genocide, crimes against humanity
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Foreign aid and international relief
Human rights
International affairs
International law and treaties
Middle East
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Syria
United Nations
War crimes, genocide, crimes against humanity