US SB747 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 12 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - By Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 116-39.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Diesel Emissions Reduction Act of 2019 This bill reauthorizes through FY2024 and revises the diesel emissions reduction program. The program authorizes the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) to provide grants, rebates, or loans for replacing diesel engines or retrofitting the engines with pollution control technologies. The bill modifies requirements governing how the EPA must prioritize projects when providing grants, rebates, and loans. Specifically, the EPA must recognize differences in how vehicles, engines, equipment, and fleets are used across the country as it prioritizes projects that include certified engine configurations, verified technologies, or emerging technologies that have a long expected useful life. Under current law, the EPA must use a certain percentage of the funds made available for the program to support state administered programs for reducing diesel emissions. If a state does not quality for funds, then the funds for the unqualified state must be reallocated to qualified states. This bill requires the funds for the unqualified state to be reallocated to the national diesel emissions reduction program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Diesel Emissions Reduction Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateBy Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 116-39.
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 71.
2019-04-10SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Barrasso without amendment. Without written report.
2019-04-10SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2019-03-13SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 116-10.
2019-03-12SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1794-1795)

Same As/Similar To

HB1768 (Related) 2019-09-10 - Received in the Senate.
SB2302 (Related) 2019-08-01 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 170.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback