US SB747 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-13 - By Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 116-39.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-13 - By Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 116-39.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reauthorizes through FY2024 and revises the diesel emissions reduction program. The program authorizes the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) to provide grants, rebates, or loans for replacing diesel engines or retrofitting the engines with pollution control technologies. The bill modifies requirements governing how the EPA must prioritize projects when providing grants, rebates, and loans. Specifically, the EPA must recognize differences in how vehicles, engines, equipment, and fleets are used across the country as it prioritizes projects that include certified engine configurations, verified technologies, or emerging technologies that have a long expected useful life. Under current law, the EPA must use a certain percentage of the funds made available for the program to support state administered programs for reducing diesel emissions. If a state does not quality for funds, then the funds for the unqualified state must be reallocated to qualified states. requires the funds for the unqualified state to be reallocated to the national diesel emissions reduction program.
Title
Diesel Emissions Reduction Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] | Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] | Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] |
Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] |
Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | By Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 116-39. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 71. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Barrasso without amendment. Without written report. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 116-10. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1794-1795) |
Same As/Similar To
HB1768 (Related) 2019-12-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB2302 (Related) 2020-01-08 - By Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 116-200.
SB2302 (Related) 2020-01-08 - By Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 116-200.
Subjects
Air quality
Environmental protection
Environmental technology
Government lending and loan guarantees
Motor fuels
Motor vehicles
Environmental protection
Environmental technology
Government lending and loan guarantees
Motor fuels
Motor vehicles