US SB745 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 31 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-09-27 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 591.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 31 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-09-27 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 591.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Magna Water District Water Reuse and Groundwater Recharge Act of 2009 - Amends the Reclamation Wastewater and Groundwater Study and Facilities Act to authorize the Secretary of the Interior, in cooperation with the Magna Water District, Utah, to participate in the design, planning, and construction of permanent facilities needed to establish recycled water distribution and wastewater treatment and reclamation facilities that will be used to provide recycled water in that District. Limits the federal share of the capital cost of the project to 25% of the total cost of the project. Allows each cost incurred by the District after January 1, 2003, relating to any capital, planning, design, permitting, construction, or land acquisition (including the value of reallocated water rights) for the project to be credited towards the non-federal share of the project's costs. Prohibits funds provided by the Secretary from being used for the project's operation or maintenance. Authorizes appropriations.
Title
Magna Water District Water Reuse and Groundwater Recharge Act of 2009
Sponsors
Sen. Orrin Hatch [R-UT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-27 | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 591. | |
2010-09-27 | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Bingaman with an amendment. With written report No. 111-305. | |
2010-07-21 | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. | |
2010-04-27 | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 111-619. | |
2009-03-31 | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. | |
2009-03-31 | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S4071-4072) |
Same As/Similar To
HB2265 (Same As) 2010-04-27 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power. Hearings held.