US SB735 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-15 - Became Public Law No: 111-20.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-15 - Became Public Law No: 111-20.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.) Protecting Incentives for the Adoption of Children with Special Needs Act of 2009 - Amends the Omnibus Appropriations Act, 2009 to repeal the limitation on FY2008 adoption incentive payments to states to the same manner as such incentives were awarded in FY2008 for the previous fiscal year.
Title
Protecting Incentives for the Adoption of Children with Special Needs Act of 2009
Sponsors
Sen. Max Baucus [D-MT] | Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-15 | Became Public Law No: 111-20. | |
2009-05-15 | Signed by President. | |
2009-05-05 | Presented to President. | |
2009-04-29 | Cleared for White House. | |
2009-04-29 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2009-04-29 | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4959) | |
2009-04-29 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 735. | |
2009-04-29 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4959-4960) | |
2009-04-29 | Mr. McDermott moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. | |
2009-04-21 | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. | |
2009-04-21 | Received in the House. | |
2009-04-03 | Message on Senate action sent to the House. | |
2009-04-03 | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 4/02/2009 S4397) | |
2009-04-03 | Senate Committee on Finance discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR 4/02/2009 S4397) | |
2009-03-30 | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1840 (Same As) 2009-04-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.