US SB730 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-24 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 101.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-24 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 101.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to extend the deadline for commencement of construction of certain hydroelectric projects. (Sec. 1) This bill authorizes the Federal Energy Regulatory Commission (FERC), upon request, to extend by six years the time period during which construction must commence on the Gathright Hydroelectric Project located in Alleghany County, Virginia, and the Flannagan Dam and Reservoir Hydroelectric Project located in Dickenson County, Virginia. Additionally, FERC may reinstate either construction license if it is expired.
Title
A bill to extend the deadline for commencement of construction of certain hydroelectric projects.
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 101. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 115-82. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1999) |
Same As/Similar To
HB446 (Related) 2018-07-23 - Became Public Law No: 115-202. (TXT | PDF)
HB447 (Related) 2018-07-23 - Became Public Law No: 115-203. (TXT | PDF)
HB5895 (Related) 2018-09-21 - Became Public Law No: 115-244.
HB447 (Related) 2018-07-23 - Became Public Law No: 115-203. (TXT | PDF)
HB5895 (Related) 2018-09-21 - Became Public Law No: 115-244.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Alternative and renewable resources
Dams and canals
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy
Federal Energy Regulatory Commission (FERC)
Licensing and registrations
Virginia
Alternative and renewable resources
Dams and canals
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy
Federal Energy Regulatory Commission (FERC)
Licensing and registrations
Virginia