US SB729 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 60.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

John Muir National Historic Site Expansion Act (Sec. 3) The Department of the Interior may acquire by donation approximately 44 acres of land to include in the John Muir National Historic Site in Martinez, California. The acquired land shall be administered as part of such site.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

John Muir National Historic Site Expansion Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-09SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 60.
2017-05-09SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 115-47.
2017-03-30SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2017-03-27SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Same As/Similar To

HB1719 (Related) 2018-06-22 - Became Public Law No: 115-191. (TXT | PDF)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback