US SB714 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-09-06 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 149.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-09-06 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 149.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Federal Land Transaction Facilitation Act Reauthorization of 2011 - Amends the Federal Land Transaction Facilitation Act (FLTFA) to reauthorize, until July 25, 2021, the program for the completion of appraisals and satisfaction of other legal requirements for the sale or exchange of public land identified for disposal under approved land use plans under the Federal Land Policy and Management Act of 1976. Revises the FLTFA definition of "federally designated area" to include all the lands within specified boundaries. (Current law is limited to lands which, as of July 25, 2000, were within such specified boundaries.) Makes the FLTFA non-applicable to land eligible for sale under specified public land laws.
Title
Federal Land Transaction Facilitation Act Reauthorization of 2011
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Bingaman [D-NM] | Sen. Max Baucus [D-MT] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] |
Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Mark Udall [D-CO] | Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 149. |
2011-09-06 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Bingaman with an amendment. With written report No. 112-69. |
2011-07-14 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2011-05-25 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands and Forests. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 112-131. |
2011-04-04 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3365 (Related) 2012-05-17 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
SB3525 (Related) 2012-11-26 - Returned to the Calendar. Calendar No. 504.
SB3525 (Related) 2012-11-26 - Returned to the Calendar. Calendar No. 504.