US SB710 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-08 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 133.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-08 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 133.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to reinstate and extend the deadline for commencement of construction of a hydroelectric project involving Jennings Randolph Dam. (Sec. 1) This bill authorizes the Federal Energy Regulatory Commission (FERC), upon request, to extend for up to six years the time period during which construction must commence on the Jennings Randolph Hydroelectric Project located on the North Branch of the Potomac River in Garrett County, Maryland, and Mineral County, West Virginia. Additionally, FERC may reinstate the construction license if it is expired.
Title
A bill to reinstate and extend the deadline for commencement of construction of a hydroelectric project involving Jennings Randolph Dam.
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 133. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with amendments. With written report No. 115-103. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2122 (Same As) 2018-07-23 - Became Public Law No: 115-205. (TXT | PDF)
HB5895 (Related) 2018-09-21 - Became Public Law No: 115-244.
HB5895 (Related) 2018-09-21 - Became Public Law No: 115-244.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Alternative and renewable resources
Dams and canals
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy
Federal Energy Regulatory Commission (FERC)
Licensing and registrations
West Virginia
Alternative and renewable resources
Dams and canals
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy
Federal Energy Regulatory Commission (FERC)
Licensing and registrations
West Virginia