US SB706 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on December 16 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-16 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 16 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-16 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Transnational Drug Trafficking Act of 2013 - Amends the Controlled Substances Import and Export Act to prohibit the manufacture or distribution of a controlled substance in schedule I or II, flunitrazepam, or a listed chemical by individuals having reasonable cause to believe that such substance or chemical will be unlawfully imported into the United States or into waters within 12 miles of the U.S. coast. Prohibits the manufacture or distribution of a listed chemical: (1) intending or knowing that it will be used to manufacture a controlled substance; and (2) intending, knowing, or having reasonable cause to believe that the substance will be unlawfully imported into the United States. Amends the federal criminal code to revise the prohibition against, and penalties for, intentionally trafficking in a counterfeit drug to apply to intentionally trafficking in a drug and knowingly using a counterfeit mark on or in connection with such drug.
Title
Transnational Drug Trafficking Act of 2013
Sponsors
Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Heidi Heitkamp [D-ND] |
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-16 | House | Held at the desk. |
2014-12-16 | House | Received in the House. |
2014-12-16 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2014-12-15 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S6840-6841) |
2014-12-15 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6840-6841) |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2591) |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S2590-2591) |
Same As/Similar To
HB2114 (Same As) 2013-06-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Subjects
Crime and law enforcement
Crimes against property
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Intellectual property
Crimes against property
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Intellectual property