US SB705 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-19 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-19 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Child Protection Improvements Act of 2017 This bill amends the National Child Protection Act of 1993 to direct the Department of Justice to establish a program to provide national criminal history background checks and criminal history reviews for individuals who apply to work or volunteer at organizations that serve children, elderly adults, or individuals with disabilities.
Title
Child Protection Improvements Act of 2017
Sponsors
Sen. Orrin Hatch [R-UT] | Sen. Al Franken [D-MN] | Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] |
Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] | Sen. John McCain [R-AZ] | Sen. John Kennedy [R-LA] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] |
Sen. Ben Sasse [R-NE] | Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-19 | House | Held at the desk. |
2017-10-19 | House | Received in the House. |
2017-10-17 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2017-10-16 | Senate | S.Amdt.1113 Amendment SA 1113 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-10-16 | Senate | S.Amdt.1113 Amendment SA 1113 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Hatch. (consideration: CR S6410; text: CR S6410) To amend the title. |
2017-10-16 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-10-16 | Senate | S.Amdt.1112 Amendment SA 1112 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-10-16 | Senate | S.Amdt.1112 Amendment SA 1112 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Hatch. (consideration: CR S6410) In the nature of a substitute. |
2017-10-16 | Senate | The committee amendments withdrawn by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-10-16 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6409-6410; text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S6410) |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 218. |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Grassley with amendments. Without written report. |
2017-09-07 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB695 (Related) 2019-01-02 - Considered by Senate (Message from the House considered).
Subjects
Adult day care
Aging
Child care and development
Child safety and welfare
Crime and law enforcement
Crimes against children
Criminal justice information and records
Disability and paralysis
Personnel records
User charges and fees
Aging
Child care and development
Child safety and welfare
Crime and law enforcement
Crimes against children
Criminal justice information and records
Disability and paralysis
Personnel records
User charges and fees