US SB690 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1-1)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-08-02 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 196.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-08-02 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 196.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
HUBZone Investment Protection Act (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Small Business Act with respect to Historically Underutilized Business Zones (HUBZones) located in qualified census tracts, qualified nonmetropolitan counties, or redesignated areas, which are census tracts or nonmetropolitan counties that cease to meet the ordinary criteria for the HUBZone program but are "redesignated" to qualify for it. The bill increases the length of time a census tract or nonmetropolitan county may be redesignated to qualify for HUBZone status from three years to seven years after the date on which the area ceased to meet the ordinary criteria.
Title
HUBZone Investment Protection Act
Sponsors
Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. James Risch [R-ID] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] |
Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] |
Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 196. |
2017-08-02 | Senate | Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Reported by Senator Risch without amendment. Without written report. |
2017-08-02 | Senate | Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2013 (Related) 2017-04-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
HB3294 (Related) 2017-07-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
HB3294 (Related) 2017-07-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Subjects
Census and government statistics
Commerce
Economic development
Public contracts and procurement
Small business
Commerce
Economic development
Public contracts and procurement
Small business