US SB690 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on April 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-12 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 113-111.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-12 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 113-111.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Filipino Veterans Fairness Act of 2013 - Deems certain service performed before July 1, 1946, in the organized military forces of the Philippines and the Philippine Scouts as active military service for purposes of eligibility for veterans' benefits through the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA). Directs the Secretary of Veterans Affairs, in determining eligibility under this Act, to take into account any relevant service documentation, including documentation other than the Missouri List (the list of all discharged and deceased veterans from the 20th century).
Title
Filipino Veterans Fairness Act of 2013
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] | Sen. Mark Begich [D-AK] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-12 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 113-111. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2507) |
Same As/Similar To
HB1452 (Same As) 2013-04-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Asia
Philippines
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
Veterans' medical care
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Asia
Philippines
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
Veterans' medical care
Veterans' pensions and compensation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/senate-bill/690/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/s690/BILLS-113s690is.pdf |