US SB673 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-28 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 569.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-28 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 569.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to provide a temporary safe harbor for publishers of online content to collectively negotiate with dominant online platforms regarding the terms on which content may be distributed.
Title
Journalism Competition and Preservation Act of 2022
Sponsors
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. John Kennedy [R-LA] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Rand Paul [R-KY] |
Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Cynthia Lummis [R-WY] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] |
Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] |
Sen. John Thune [R-SD] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 569. |
2022-11-28 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Durbin with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2022-09-22 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary Subcommittee on Competition Policy, Antitrust, and Consumer Rights. Hearings held. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1735 (Same As) 2021-05-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
SB4796 (Related) 2022-09-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB4796 (Related) 2022-09-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.