US SB669 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-03 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 825.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-03 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 825.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Columbia River In-Lieu and Treaty Fishing Access Sites Improvement Act (Sec. 2) This bill authorizes the Bureau of Indian Affairs (BIA) to assess sanitation and safety conditions on land set aside to provide Columbia River Treaty tribes access to traditional fishing grounds. The bill applies to land held by the United States for the benefit of the Nez Perce Tribe, the Confederated Tribes of Umatilla Indian Reservation, the Confederated Tribes of the Warm Springs Reservation of Oregon, and the Confederated Tribes and Bands of the Yakama Nation. The BIA may enter into contracts with tribes or tribal organizations to improve sanitation, safety conditions, and access to electricity, sewer, and water infrastructure on this land. (Sec. 3) The Government Accountability Office must evaluate whether the sanitation and safety conditions on the lands have improved as a result of the contracts and report on the results of the evaluation.
Title
Columbia River In-Lieu and Treaty Fishing Access Sites Improvement Act
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-03 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 825. |
2018-12-03 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-1059. |
2018-11-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-11-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-11-15 | House | Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs Discharged. |
2017-12-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs. |
2017-11-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-11-30 | House | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2017-11-30 | House | Received in the House. |
2017-11-29 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S7497-7498) |
2017-11-29 | Senate | S.Amdt.1638 Amendment SA 1638 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-11-29 | Senate | S.Amdt.1638 Amendment SA 1638 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Hoeven. (consideration: CR S7497-7498; text: CR S7497) To authorize a study of the program to assess sanitation and safety conditions at Bureau of Indian Affairs facilities that were constructed to provide affected Columbia River Treaty tribes access to traditional fishing grounds and make related improvements. |
2017-11-29 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7497-7498) |
2017-08-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 193. |
2017-08-02 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Hoeven without amendment. With written report No. 115-143. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1630 (Same As) 2017-03-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
Subjects
Electric power generation and transmission
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Government studies and investigations
Hunting and fishing
Indian lands and resources rights
Native Americans
Oregon
Solid waste and recycling
Water quality
Water use and supply
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Government studies and investigations
Hunting and fishing
Indian lands and resources rights
Native Americans
Oregon
Solid waste and recycling
Water quality
Water use and supply