US SB653 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. (text of measure as introduced: CR S1897-1898)
Pending: Senate Small Business And Entrepreneurship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. (text of measure as introduced: CR S1897-1898)
Pending: Senate Small Business And Entrepreneurship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Southeast Hurricanes Small Business Disaster Relief Act of 2011 - Amends the Food, Conservation, and Energy Act of 2008 to direct the Administrator of the Small Business Administration (SBA) to establish a Southeast Hurricanes Small Business Disaster Relief Program (Program) under which the Administrator may waive, for up to three years and $15,000 total, the interest payments of small businesses that resume operations in a declared disaster area during the period beginning on: (1) September 1, 2005, and ending on October 1, 2006, for loans relating to Hurricanes Katrina or Rita of 2005; or (2) September 1, 2008, and ending on January 1, 2009, for loans relating to Hurricanes Gustav or Ike of 2008. Includes under the Program any small business that demonstrates substantial economic injury as a result of the Deepwater Horizon oil spill of April 20, 2010.
Title
Southeast Hurricanes Small Business Disaster Relief Act of 2011
Sponsors
Sen. Mary Landrieu [D-LA] | Sen. Thad Cochran [R-MS] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-28 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. (text of measure as introduced: CR S1897-1898) |
2011-03-28 | Senate | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S1896-1897) |
Same As/Similar To
HB1336 (Related) 2011-04-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
Subjects
Alabama
Commerce
Disaster relief and insurance
Government lending and loan guarantees
Gulf of Mexico
Louisiana
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine pollution
Mississippi
Natural disasters
Oil and gas
Pollution liability
Small business
Texas
Commerce
Disaster relief and insurance
Government lending and loan guarantees
Gulf of Mexico
Louisiana
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine pollution
Mississippi
Natural disasters
Oil and gas
Pollution liability
Small business
Texas
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/senate-bill/653/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/s653/BILLS-112s653is.pdf |