US SB65 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Presidential Conflicts of Interest Act of 2017 This bill requires the President and Vice President to submit to Congress and the Office of Government Ethics a disclosure of financial interests. Among the contents of such disclosure, the President and Vice President shall: (1) include a detailed description of each financial interest of the President and Vice President, the spouse of the President and Vice President, or a minor child of the President and Vice President; and (2) include the tax returns filed by or on behalf of the President and Vice President for the three most recent taxable years. The President, the Vice President, the spouse of the President or Vice President, and any minor child of the President or Vice President must divest any financial interest posing a potential conflict of interest by transferring such interest to a qualified blind trust. Within a reasonable period of time after such financial interest is transferred to a qualified blind trust, the trustee of such trust shall: (1) sell the financial interest; and (2) use the proceeds from the sale of the financial interest to purchase conflict-free holdings. The Office of Government Ethics shall submit to Congress, the President, and the Vice President an annual report regarding the financial interests of such officials, their spouses, and any of their minor children. The Attorney General, the attorney general of any state, or any person aggrieved by a violation of divestiture requirements posing a potential conflict of interest may seek declaratory or injunctive relief if: (1) the Office of Government Ethics is unable to issue a report indicating whether the President or Vice President is in substantial compliance with such divestiture requirements; or (2) there is probable cause to believe the President or the Vice President has not complied with such requirements. The bill amends the federal criminal code to require the recusal of presidential appointees from decisions affecting the financial holdings of a President or the spouse of a President. Prohibitions pertaining to contracts entered into by Members of Congress are extended to contracts by the President or Vice President. The bill amends the Ethics in Government Act of 1978 to require the disclosure of tax returns by the incumbent President and presidential nominees of a major political party for the three most recent taxable years. The bill declares the sense of Congress that a violation of divestiture requirements of this bill or the Ethics in Government in Government Act of 1978 by the President or the Vice President would constitute a high crime or misdemeanor.
Title
Presidential Conflicts of Interest Act of 2017
Sponsors
Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] |
Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] |
Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] |
Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] |
Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Al Franken [D-MN] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] |
Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] |
Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] | Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] |
Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] |
Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-09 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB305 (Related) 2017-04-05 - Motion to Discharge Committee filed by Ms. Eshoo. Petition No: 115-1. (Discharge petition text with signatures.)
HB371 (Same As) 2017-02-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
SB26 (Related) 2017-01-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
SB1880 (Related) 2017-09-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3357 (Related) 2018-08-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB371 (Same As) 2017-02-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
SB26 (Related) 2017-01-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
SB1880 (Related) 2017-09-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3357 (Related) 2018-08-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Civil actions and liability
Congressional oversight
Corporate finance and management
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Federal officials
Financial services and investments
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Public contracts and procurement
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Congressional oversight
Corporate finance and management
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Federal officials
Financial services and investments
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Public contracts and procurement
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/65/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s65/BILLS-115s65is.pdf |