US SB640 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-03 - Committee on Environment and Public Works. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 114-47.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-03 - Committee on Environment and Public Works. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 114-47.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
ORDEAL Act of 2015 Ozone Regulatory Delay and Extension of Assessment Length Act of 2015 This bill amends the Clean Air Act to lengthen from 5 years to 10 years the intervals at which the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) is required to review and revise air quality criteria and primary and secondary national ambient air quality standards (NAAQS). This bill eliminates the EPA's authority to review and revise criteria or promulgate new standards for ozone concentrations earlier or more frequently than required. The EPA may not review and revise NAAQS for ozone concentrations before February 1, 2018. The EPA must complete a thorough review of the NAAQS for ozone concentrations and make revisions no later December 31, 2018. The intervals at which an independent scientific review committee is required to review air quality criteria and NAAQS and recommend any new standards or revisions to existing criteria and standards are lengthened from 5 years to 10 years. The bill delays the review by an independent scientific review committee of NAAQS for ozone concentrations until February 1, 2018.
Title
ORDEAL Act of 2015 Ozone Regulatory Delay and Extension of Assessment Length Act of 2015
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Flake [R-AZ] | Sen. John McCain [R-AZ] | Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] |
Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] | Sen. Michael Enzi [R-WY] | Sen. Daniel Coats [R-IN] | Sen. Mike Lee [R-UT] |
Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. David Vitter [R-LA] | Sen. John Thune [R-SD] | Sen. Orrin Hatch [R-UT] |
Sen. Jeff Sessions [R-AL] | Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-03 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 114-47. |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1327 (Related) 2015-03-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Air quality
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Air quality
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/senate-bill/640/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/s640/BILLS-114s640is.pdf |